WI SB31 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.395 (2) (ec) and 84.182 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a local freight bridge program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a local freight bridge program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb31 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB31.pdf |