WI SB308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 111.36 (2); to amend 15.04 (1) (g), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 36.09 (1) (e), 36.11 (3) (a), 36.12 (1), 36.29 (1), 38.04 (13) (b), 38.23 (1), 47.02 (3m) (f), 48.82 (6), 51.90, 66.0125 (3) (a), 66.0125 (3) (c) 1. b., 66.0125 (9), 66.1011 (1), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 86.195 (5) (c), 106.50 (1), 106.50 (1m) (h), 106.50 (1m) (nm), 106.50 (5m) (f) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 2., 106.52 (3) (a) 3., 106.52 (3) (a) 4., 106.52 (3) (a) 5., 106.58, 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321, 111.36 (title), 111.36 (1) (a), 111.36 (1) (c), 111.36 (1) (d) 1., 111.36 (1) (d) 2., 111.70 (2), 111.81 (12) (b), 111.85 (2) (b), 118.019 (2d), 118.13 (1), 118.20 (1), 118.40 (4) (b) 2., 194.025, 224.77 (1) (o), 227.10 (3) (a), 230.01 (2) (b), 230.18, 234.29, 321.37, 440.45 (1), 440.45 (2), 452.14 (3) (n), 625.12 (2), 632.35 and 756.001 (3); and to create 106.50 (1m) (kg), 106.52 (1) (cr), 111.32 (7j) and 628.34 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: discrimination in employment, housing, public accommodations, education, insurance coverage, jury duty, and the receipt of mental health or vocational rehabilitation services. (FE)
Title
Discrimination in employment, housing, public accommodations, education, insurance coverage, jury duty, and the receipt of mental health or vocational rehabilitation services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb308 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB308.pdf |