WI SB307 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.30 (1), 343.31 (3) (a), 343.31 (3) (c), 343.31 (3) (f), 343.38 (1) (intro.), 343.38 (3), 345.47 (1) (intro.), 345.60 (1), 346.17 (4), 346.22 (1) (a), (b), (d) and (e), 346.22 (3), 346.65 (3m), 346.65 (3p), 346.65 (3r), 346.95 (1) and (2) and 349.06 (1) (a); and to create 38.04 (4) (e) 7., 115.28 (11) (g), 340.01 (74p), 343.31 (2t) (a) 4. and 5., 343.31 (2v), 343.71 (5) (g), 345.60 (5), 346.17 (6), 346.22 (5), 346.30 (5), 346.36 (3), 346.43 (4), 346.49 (5), 346.56 (5), 346.60 (6), 346.74 (7), 346.82 (3) and 346.95 (12) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic violations resulting in harm to vulnerable highway users, driver education instruction, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Traffic violations resulting in harm to vulnerable highway users, driver education instruction, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb307 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB307.pdf |