WI SB303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.962 (1) (a), 440.962 (1) (b), 440.962 (1) (c), 440.962 (1) (d) and 440.964; to renumber 440.96 (2); to renumber and amend 440.96 (1); to amend 440.965; and to create 440.96 (1g), 440.96 (2m), 440.96 (3), 440.962 (1) (am), 440.968 (1) (e), 440.9693 and 440.9696 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-12 | House | Representative Rohrkaste withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Kapenga and Johnson |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb303 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB303.pdf |