WI SB300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 450.02 (2); to amend 146.81 (1) (fm), 146.997 (1) (d) 8., 450.01 (16) (g), 450.01 (21e) (a), 450.02 (3) (f), 450.03 (1) (e), 450.03 (1) (i), 450.035 (2h), 450.035 (2i) (a) and (b), 450.035 (3), 450.035 (4), 450.062 (intro.), 450.08 (1), 450.08 (2) (b), 450.10 (1) (a) 1., 450.10 (1) (a) 2., 450.10 (1) (a) 3., 450.10 (1) (a) 6., 450.10 (1) (b) (intro.), 450.10 (1) (b) 3., 450.10 (2), 450.10 (3) (a) 1., 450.11 (1b) (bm), 450.11 (1b) (d), 450.11 (1b) (e) 2., 450.11 (3), 450.11 (7) (d), 450.11 (8) (a) and 450.17; to repeal and recreate 146.89 (1) (r) 4. and 450.08 (title); and to create 440.03 (13) (b) 48m., 440.08 (2) (a) 56m., 450.01 (15g), 450.01 (16c), 450.02 (2) (b), 450.03 (1) (gm) and 450.068 of the statutes; Relating to: registration of pharmacy technicians, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration of pharmacy technicians, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 100 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 1 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |