WI SB300 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.83 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 77.83 (1) (d) of the statutes; relating to: certain areas of land subject to managed forest land orders that were part of a parcel of land under single ownership that exceeded 8,000 acres in size.
Title
Certain areas of land subject to managed forest land orders that were part of a parcel of land under single ownership that exceeded 8,000 acres in size.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Russell Decker [D] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-11-18 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Forestry | |
2009-10-29 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-15 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-15 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-15 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-15 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-30 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-09-23 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb300 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB300.pdf |