WI SB30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Representative Callahan added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 450.095 (title) and 450.095 (3); and to create 49.46 (2) (bg), 450.01 (16) (L), 450.095 (1) (ag) and (ar) and 450.095 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenateRepresentative Callahan added as a cosponsor
2021-10-07SenateRepresentative Subeck added as a cosponsor
2021-02-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-02-11SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback