WI SB30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 29.097 and 29.971 (1n) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting contests for killing wild animals and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting contests for killing wild animals and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-02-28SenateRepresentative Doyle withdrawn as a cosponsor
2019-02-26SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-19SenateSenator Larson added as a coauthor
2019-02-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback