WI SB30 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.415 of the statutes; Relating to: the display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Rep. Leon Young [D] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
Rep. Dana Wachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2016-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb30 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB30.pdf |