WI SB30 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 62.53; to amend 62.53 (title) and 63.25 (1) (a); and to create 62.53 (2) of the statutes; relating to: placing limits on residency requirements for 1st class city police officers and fire fighters. (FE)
Title
Placing limits on residency requirements for 1st class city police officers and fire fighters. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Rep. William Kramer [R] |
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Mark Honadel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 2, Noes 3 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-29 | Senate | LRB correction |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb30 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB30.pdf |