WI SB30 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.07 (1) (a) 2. and 125.07 (4) (a) 2. of the statutes; relating to: underage persons possessing, consuming, or being provided alcohol beverages on licensed premises when accompanied by a parent, guardian, or spouse.
Title
Underage persons possessing, consuming, or being provided alcohol beverages on licensed premises when accompanied by a parent, guardian, or spouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-08 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-08 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-08 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-07 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-09 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Robson | |
2009-08-19 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families and Workforce Development | |
2009-02-03 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb30 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB30.pdf |