WI SB3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Published 4-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 66.0901 (1) (a); to amend 16.971 (4) (c) 2., 66.0901 (6) and 66.0901 (9) (a); and to create 16.75 (1p), 16.855 (1p), 66.0901 (1) (ae), 66.0901 (1) (am), 66.0901 (6m) and 66.0901 (6s) of the statutes; Relating to: project labor agreements and public contracts. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Project labor agreements and public contracts. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenatePublished 4-18-2017
2017-04-18SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-17-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 3
2017-04-13SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-13-2017
2017-03-17SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-03-09SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-03-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-03-09HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseRules suspended
2017-03-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Barca, Wachs, Hesselbein and Spreitzer
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Bowen, Kessler, Spreitzer, Hesselbein, Young, Fields and Riemer
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Ohnstad and Sinicki
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Sinicki and Hebl
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Hesselbein, Milroy, Sinicki and Barca
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2017-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Hesselbein and Barca
2017-03-09HouseRead a second time
2017-03-09HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2017-03-01HousePlaced on calendar 3-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-02-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2017-02-09HouseRepresentative Stafsholt added as a cosponsor
2017-02-08HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-02-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2017-02-08SenateRules suspended
2017-02-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-02-08SenateSenate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2017-02-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2017-02-08SenatePlaced on the calendar of 2-8-2017 following Senate Bill 10
2017-02-08SenateRead a second time
2017-02-08SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Ringhand, Wirch, Shilling, Miller, Bewley, Carpenter, L. Taylor and Hansen
2017-02-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators L. Taylor, Ringhand, Wirch, Bewley, Johnson, Carpenter, Miller, Shilling, Vinehout and Hansen
2017-02-06SenatePlaced on calendar 2-8-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-02-02SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-02-02SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-02-02SenateExecutive action taken
2017-02-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-01-25SenatePublic hearing held
2017-01-20SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2017-01-13SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb3
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB3.pdf
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2017/REG/SB3.pdf
Texthttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2017/3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/sv0013
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/sv0014
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/sv0015
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0016
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0017
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0018
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0019
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0020
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0021
Roll Callhttp://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2017/av0022

Bill Comments

feedback