WI SB3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.60 (2) (bm), 118.60 (4) (bg), 118.60 (11) (d), 119.23 (4) (bg) 1. and 119.23 (11) (d); to renumber and amend 118.016 (1) and 118.31 (1); to amend 115.28 (7) (b), 118.016 (1g), (1r) and (2), 118.19 (1), 118.30 (5m), 118.305 (1) (h), 118.305 (3) (e), 118.31 (2), 118.31 (3) (intro.), 118.31 (4), 118.31 (5), 118.31 (6), 118.60 (2) (a) (intro.), 118.60 (2) (a) 1. a., 118.60 (2) (c), 118.60 (3) (c), 118.60 (4) (d) (intro.), 118.60 (4) (d) 2., 118.60 (4r) (a), 118.60 (7) (am) 1., 118.60 (7) (b) 3m., 118.60 (7) (d) 1. b., 118.60 (10) (a) 3., 118.60 (10) (a) 7., 118.60 (10) (c), 119.23 (2) (a) 1. a., 119.23 (2) (c), 119.23 (4) (d) (intro.), 119.23 (4) (d) 2., 119.23 (4r) (a), 119.23 (7) (am) 1., 119.23 (7) (b) 3m., 119.23 (7) (d) 1. b., 119.23 (10) (a) 3., 119.23 (10) (a) 7. and 119.23 (10) (c); to repeal and recreate 118.60 (4m) and 119.23 (4m); and to create 118.016 (1) (b), 118.305 (1) (gm), 118.31 (1) (b), 118.33 (1) (f) 5., 118.60 (2) (a) 1. am., 118.60 (2) (a) 6m., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 118.60 (2) (d), 118.60 (4) (bd), 118.60 (7) (b) 9., 118.60 (7) (d) 1. d., 118.60 (7) (i), 118.60 (10) (a) 9., 118.60 (10) (a) 10., 118.60 (10) (bg), 118.60 (10) (br), 119.23 (2) (a) 1. am., 119.23 (2) (a) 6m., 119.23 (2) (a) 9., 119.23 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (d), 119.23 (4) (bd), 119.23 (7) (b) 9., 119.23 (7) (d) 1. d., 119.23 (7) (i), 119.23 (10) (a) 9., 119.23 (10) (a) 10., 119.23 (10) (bg), 119.23 (10) (br) and 120.13 (1) (i) of the statutes; Relating to: accountability provisions for private schools participating in a parental choice program and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Accountability provisions for private schools participating in a parental choice program and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Education, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Education Reform, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education Reform and Government Operations |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb3 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB3.pdf |