WI SB296 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.69 (5) (e) 5g., 60.61 (4) (c) 2. and 62.23 (7) (e) 15.; to renumber 66.10015 (3); to amend 59.69 (5e) (e), 60.61 (4e) (e), 62.23 (6) (g), 62.23 (6) (h), 62.23 (7) (b), 62.23 (7) (de) 5., 66.10015 (title), 236.13 (5) and 781.10 (2) (a); to repeal and recreate 59.694 (10), 62.23 (7) (e) 10. and 66.10015 (3) (title); and to create 60.65 (6), 66.10015 (1m), 66.10015 (3) (a), 66.10016, 781.10, 808.04 (1s) and 809.108 of the statutes; Relating to: judicial review of local governmental decisions related to certain land development, local approval of residential housing development, and amendment of zoning ordinances. (FE)
Title
Judicial review of local governmental decisions related to certain land development, local approval of residential housing development, and amendment of zoning ordinances. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Representatives Subeck and Emerson added as cosponsors |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-14-2023 |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senators Taylor and Spreitzer added as coauthors |
2023-06-14 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |