WI SB296 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 111.32 (10), 440.01 (2) (a), 440.03 (9) (d), 440.14 (2), 440.14 (3), 440.21 (1), 440.21 (2), 440.21 (3), 440.23 (title) and 440.23 (3); to repeal and recreate 440.14 (2) and 440.14 (3); and to create 440.03 (9) (cm), 440.23 (2g) and (2r) and chapter 475 of the statutes; Relating to: the establishment of a self-certification registry operated by the Department of Safety and Professional Services, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The establishment of a self-certification registry operated by the Department of Safety and Professional Services, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb296 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB296.pdf |