WI SB296 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 77.82 (11r) of the statutes; relating to: extensions of managed forest land orders.
Title
Extensions of managed forest land orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Marlin Schneider [D] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-01-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-14 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | |
2010-01-14 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-14 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-13 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2009-11-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-30 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-09-16 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb296 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB296.pdf |