WI SB290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend chapter 444 (title), 444.01 (1), 444.01 (2), 444.02, 444.03, 444.04, 444.06, 444.09 (title), 444.10 (title), 444.11, 444.12, 444.13, 444.14, 444.15 and 444.18; and to create 20.165 (1) (im), 444.01 (1m) and 444.095 of the statutes; relating to: changes in the regulation of boxing contests, regulating mixed martial arts fighting contests, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty.
Title
Changes in the regulation of boxing contests, regulating mixed martial arts fighting contests, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Published 2-18-2010. | |
2010-02-05 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 111 | |
2010-02-02 | Presented to the Governor on 2-2-2010 | |
2010-01-26 | Report correctly enrolled on 1-26-2010 | |
2010-01-21 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-21 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 1 | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on calendar 1-21-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-01-19 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-19 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | |
2010-01-19 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-19 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-13 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-12 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-16 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Colon | |
2009-11-10 | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection | |
2009-11-10 | Received from Senate | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Senate substitute amendment 3 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-11-04 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-11-04 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-10-29 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-29 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-29 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 3 recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-29 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-29 | Senate substitute amendment 3 offered by Senator Hansen | |
2009-10-28 | Senate substitute amendment 2 offered by Senator Hansen | |
2009-10-27 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Hansen | |
2009-10-13 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-13 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2009-09-16 | Introduced |