WI SB29 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 887.015 (2) (e); and to amend 887.015 (title), 887.015 (1), 887.015 (2) (b), 887.015 (2) (f), 887.015 (3) and 887.015 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: the Uniform Unsworn Declarations Act.
Title
The Uniform Unsworn Declarations Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Eric Wimberger [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Rep. Nik Rettinger [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] | Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-28-2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 245 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-08 | House | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |