WI SB29 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.13 (1) (b), 968.13 (1) (c) and 968.23 of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining a search warrant for certain civil violations. (FE)
Title
Obtaining a search warrant for certain civil violations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 183 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |