WI SB286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 174.02 (1) (b), 174.02 (2) (a) and (b) and 174.02 (3) (a) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: liability for damages caused by dogs, court orders to kill a dog, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Liability for damages caused by dogs, court orders to kill a dog, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | Senate | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 112 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-11-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 14 |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Harris Dodd, Erpenbach, Hansen, Wirch, Carpenter, L. Taylor, C. Larson and Ringhand |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Introduced |