WI SB284 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: affecting various provisions of the statutes to correct errors and reconcile conflicts (Corrections Bill).
Title
Affecting various provisions of the statutes to correct errors and reconcile conflicts (Corrections Bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 257 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-12-2012 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Point of order that Senate amendment 1 not germane well taken |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 02-14-2012 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Point of order that Senate amendment 1 not germane taken under advisement |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senators Taylor, Vinehout, Holperin, C. Larson, King, Shilling, T. Cullen, S. Coggs, Wirch, Miller, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Jauch and Risser |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |