WI SB280 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.02 (1d), 48.02 (2), 938.02 (1), 938.02 (10m), 938.355 (4) (b), 948.01 (1), 990.01 (3) and 990.01 (20); to amend subchapter IX (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.44], 48.44, 48.45 (1) (a), 48.45 (1) (am), 48.45 (3), 118.163 (4), 125.07 (4) (d), 125.07 (4) (e) 1., 125.085 (3) (bt), 165.83 (1) (c) 1., 165.83 (1) (c) 2., 301.12 (2m), 301.12 (14) (a), 302.31 (7), 938.12 (2), 938.18 (2), 938.183 (3), 938.255 (1) (intro.), 938.34 (8), 938.343 (2), 938.344 (3), 938.35 (1m), 938.355 (4m) (a), 938.39, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 938 [precedes 938.44], 938.44, 938.45 (1) (a), 938.45 (3), 938.48 (4m) (title), 938.48 (4m) (a), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (14), 938.57 (3) (title), 938.57 (3) (a) (intro.), 938.57 (3) (a) 1., 938.57 (3) (a) 3., 938.57 (3) (b), 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 939.632 (1) (e) 3., 946.50 (intro.), 948.11 (2) (am) (intro.), 948.45 (1), 948.60 (2) (d), 948.61 (4), 961.455 (title), 961.455 (1), 961.455 (2), 961.46, 961.573 (2), 961.574 (2), 961.575 (1), 961.575 (2) and 961.575 (3); and to create 48.02 (1d) (a), 48.02 (1d) (b), 48.02 (2) (a), 48.02 (2) (b), 938.02 (1) (a), 938.02 (1) (b), 938.02 (10m) (a), 938.02 (10m) (b), 938.355 (4) (b) 2., 948.01 (1) (a), 948.01 (1) (b), 990.01 (3) (a), 990.01 (3) (b), 990.01 (20) (a) and 990.01 (20) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who has not been charged with certain violent offenses, and has not, after previously being convicted of a crime or adjudicated delinquent, been charged with a crime or alleged in a complaint or citation to have violated a civil law or municipal ordinance, is subject to juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Title
The age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who has not been charged with certain violent offenses, and has not, after previously being convicted of a crime or adjudicated delinquent, been charged with a crime or alleged in a complaint or citation to have violated a civil law or municipal ordinance, is subject to juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Wachs added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb280 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB280.pdf |