WI SB28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.78 and 600.01 (1) (b) 13. of the statutes; Relating to: direct primary care agreements.
Title
Direct primary care agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Representative Allen withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter and Kapenga |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb28 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB28.pdf |