WI SB28 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 979.01 (1r); to amend 979.01 (1) (intro.) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 16.009 (2) (q), 146.82 (2) (a) 8m., chapter 156 and 979.01 (1j) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb28 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB28.pdf |