WI SB28 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.91 of the statutes; relating to: composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System.
Title
Composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | Published 12-20-2011 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 89 |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 11-4-2011 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-03 | House | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 1 |
2011-09-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Colleges and Universities |
2011-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 25, Noes 7 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Senator Kapanke added as a coauthor |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |