WI SB276 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0145 of the statutes; relating to: requiring governmental bodies of school districts and certain political subdivisions to post meeting notices and minutes on their Web sites.
Title
Requiring governmental bodies of school districts and certain political subdivisions to post meeting notices and minutes on their Web sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Roys | |
2010-04-22 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Zigmunt | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:26 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 12 | |
2010-04-13 | Refused to reject Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1, Ayes 13, Noes 20 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senators Lassa and Vinehout | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-12 | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Decker | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-25 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-25 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology | |
2010-03-24 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-03 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Kreitlow | |
2009-09-03 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Kreitlow | |
2009-08-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology | |
2009-08-26 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb276 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB276.pdf |