WI SB272 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.54 (1) (g) and 71.54 (2) (b) 4.; and to amend 71.54 (1) (f) (intro.), 71.54 (2) (b) 3. and 71.54 (2m) of the statutes; relating to: restoring indexing provisions to the homestead tax credit. (FE)
Title
Restoring indexing provisions to the homestead tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue and refer to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue and refer to committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 16, Noes 17 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Introduced |