WI SB269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Published 7-9-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Published 7-9-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (1) (ng) 1. a. and 23.33 (1) (ng) 2. a. of the statutes; Relating to: the weight limit for utility terrain vehicles.
Title
The weight limit for utility terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Published 7-9-2021 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-8-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 70 |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-6-2021 |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Representative Dallman added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Representatives Wichgers and Rozar added as cosponsors |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |