WI SB269 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 66.1105 (6) (c); and to create 66.1105 (6) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: tax increment value reporting errors and property tax reimbursement. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax increment value reporting errors and property tax reimbursement. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-11-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-11-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-07HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-11-07HouseRules suspended
2019-11-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-07HouseRead a second time
2019-11-07HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-11-05HousePlaced on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-05HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-08SenateWithdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and taken up
2019-10-03SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-03SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-10-03SenateExecutive action taken
2019-09-24SenatePublic hearing held
2019-06-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-06-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
2019-06-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback