WI SB268 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.03 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: compensation of election officials performing duties during a recount. (FE)
Title
Compensation of election officials performing duties during a recount. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 12 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Representatives Allen and Knodl added as cosponsors |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |