WI SB267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.07 (3) (a) 14. of the statutes; Relating to: modifying an exception to the prohibition against underage persons being present on premises operating under an alcohol beverage license issued to a specified licensee in Chippewa Falls.
Title
Modifying an exception to the prohibition against underage persons being present on premises operating under an alcohol beverage license issued to a specified licensee in Chippewa Falls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb267 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB267.pdf |