WI SB266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - Published 10-17-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.0137 (1) (ae); to amend 20.155 (3) (t), 20.835 (1) (db), 20.835 (1) (r), 59.23 (2) (s), 66.0137 (3), 66.0137 (4m) (a), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1. and 66.0137 (5) (c) 2.; to repeal and recreate 66.0137 (5) (c) 3.; and to create 20.155 (3) (u), 66.0137 (1) (af), 66.0137 (1) (am), 66.0137 (1) (ap), 66.0137 (1) (c), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1m., 66.0137 (5) (c) 4. and 66.0137 (5) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring political subdivisions and Marquette University to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring political subdivisions and Marquette University to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors

Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]
Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]
Sen. Andre Jacque [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Roger Roth [R]
Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]
Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]
Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]
Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. John Macco [R]
Rep. Nick Milroy [D]Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]
Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. John Nygren [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]
Rep. Jim Ott [R]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]
Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]
Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Rob Stafsholt [R]Rep. David Steffen [R]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]
Rep. Amanda Stuck [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]
Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]Rep. John Jagler [R]
Rep. Robert Wittke [R]

Roll Calls

2019-10-10 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-16SenatePublished 10-17-2019
2019-10-16SenateReport approved by the Governor on 10-16-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 19
2019-10-11SenatePresented to the Governor on 10-11-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3)
2019-10-11SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-10-11SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-10-10HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-10HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0
2019-10-10HouseRules suspended
2019-10-10HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-10HouseAssembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35
2019-10-10HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl
2019-10-10HouseRead a second time
2019-10-10HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-10-08HousePlaced on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-10-08HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2019-10-08SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2019-10-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-08SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-02SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-02SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2019-10-02SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2019-10-02SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2019-10-02SenateExecutive action taken
2019-10-01SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard and Bewley
2019-09-30SenateRepresentative Vining added as a cosponsor
2019-09-27SenateWithdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
2019-09-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-25SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-25SenateExecutive action taken
2019-09-19SenateSenator Tiffany added as a coauthor
2019-09-18SenateRepresentative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor
2019-09-17SenateRepresentatives Katsma and B. Meyers added as cosponsors
2019-09-17SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-12SenateRepresentatives Brooks and Loudenbeck added as cosponsors
2019-09-11SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2019-09-11SenateRepresentative Born added as a cosponsor
2019-09-10SenateSenator Darling added as a coauthor
2019-08-15SenateSenator Larson added as a coauthor
2019-07-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard and Bewley
2019-07-11SenateRepresentative McGuire added as a cosponsor
2019-07-09SenateSenator Kooyenga added as a coauthor
2019-06-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-06-24SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-06-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-06-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback