WI SB266 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.347 (20) and 23.177 of the statutes; relating to: creating a Nonmotorized Recreation and Transportation Trails Council.
Title
Creating a Nonmotorized Recreation and Transportation Trails Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 394 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-7-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:25 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-22 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-23 | LRB correction | |
2009-10-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties | |
2009-10-22 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-20 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-10-20 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-20 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-20 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-16 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2009-10-13 | Placed on calendar 10-20-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-05 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-30 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-08-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-08-11 | Introduced |