WI SB260 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (3p) (c) 5., 71.28 (3p) (c) 5. and 71.47 (3p) (c) 5. of the statutes; relating to: allowing members of a dairy cooperative to claim the dairy manufacturing facility investment credit in the next taxable year. (FE)
Title
Allowing members of a dairy cooperative to claim the dairy manufacturing facility investment credit in the next taxable year. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 237 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-12-2012 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2011-12-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2011-10-28 | Senate | Introduced |