WI SB259 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 252.14 (1) (ar) 4q., 448.970, subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 448 [precedes 448.980] and subchapter IX (title) of chapter 448 [precedes 448.985]; to amend 15.085 (1m) (b), 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. b., 146.81 (1) (dg), 146.997 (1) (d) 4., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4e., 446.01 (1v) (d), 448.956 (1m), 448.956 (4), 450.10 (3) (a) 5., 451.02 (1) and 462.04; and to create 15.406 (7), 48.981 (2) (a) 20m., 146.81 (1) (eu), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4s., 440.03 (13) (b) 30m., 440.08 (2) (a) 37m. and subchapter VIII of chapter 448 [precedes 448.970] of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation and licensure of genetic counselors, creating a genetic counselors affiliated credentialing board, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The regulation and licensure of genetic counselors, creating a genetic counselors affiliated credentialing board, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 251 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-16 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach withdrawn as a coauthor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-16 | House | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 2 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |