WI SB258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (a) 30., 71.05 (6) (b) 55., 71.26 (2) (a) 13., 71.26 (2) (a) 14., 71.34 (1k) (q), 71.34 (1k) (r), 71.45 (2) (a) 24. and 71.45 (2) (a) 25. of the statutes; Relating to: an income tax deduction for an arrearage paid on behalf of a tenant for municipal utility service. (FE)
Title
An income tax deduction for an arrearage paid on behalf of a tenant for municipal utility service. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |