WI SB250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 7.60 (4) (c) and 8.16 (1); to amend 5.01 (3) (a), 5.01 (4) (a), 5.35 (6) (b), 5.62 (1) (a), 5.62 (1) (b) 2., 5.62 (2) (b), 5.62 (3), 5.81 (4), 5.84 (1), 5.91 (1), 5.91 (6), 6.80 (2) (am), 7.10 (2), 7.50 (1) (b), 7.50 (1) (c), 7.50 (1) (d), 7.60 (4) (a), 8.50 (3) (b), 8.50 (3) (c) and 10.02 (3) (b) 2.; and to create 5.20, 5.62 (3m), 6.80 (2) (g), 7.60 (4) (c) 3., 7.60 (4) (c) 4., 7.62 and 8.16 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: top-five primaries and instant runoff voting for the offices of U.S. senator and U.S. representative in Congress. (FE)
Title
Top-five primaries and instant runoff voting for the offices of U.S. senator and U.S. representative in Congress. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Daniel Riemer [D] |
Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Dora Drake [D] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Rep. Dave Considine [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] |
Rep. Deb Andraca [D] | Rep. Tip McGuire [D] | Rep. Alex Dallman [R] | Rep. Katrina Shankland [D] |
Rep. Jodi Emerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Representative Skowronski withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |