WI SB250 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.60 (2) (be) 2.; and to create 118.60 (2) (be) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: the pupil participation limit in the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Title
The pupil participation limit in the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb250 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB250.pdf |