WI SB248 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 968.255 (2) (ar) of the statutes; Relating to: strip searches of certain detained persons. (FE)
Title
Strip searches of certain detained persons. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 206 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-29-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Barnes |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:17 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 8 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 7 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 8 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 7 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 1-20-2016 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Introduced |