WI SB245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 51.20 (13) (cr), 165.76 (1) (am), 938.34 (15) (a) 1., 944.30 (1m) (intro.), 944.30 (2m) and 973.015 (2m) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecuting or adjudicating delinquent a person under the age of 18 for committing an act of prostitution.
Title
Prosecuting or adjudicating delinquent a person under the age of 18 for committing an act of prostitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Representatives James and Plumer added as cosponsors |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |