WI SB245 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 441.06 (3) and 441.10 (3) (b); and to create 441.001 (5) and 441.065 of the statutes; relating to: collection of workforce data on registered nurse and licensed practical nurse license renewal forms.
Title
Collection of workforce data on registered nurse and licensed practical nurse license renewal forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-08-28 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-07-28 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb245 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB245.pdf |