WI SB241 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (cp) and 39.396 of the statutes; Relating to: a school psychologist loan program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A school psychologist loan program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-12-08 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-11-10 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |