WI SB240 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-12)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.01 (2) (c) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: directing school boards to provide instruction on Hmong Americans and Asian Americans.
Title
Directing school boards to provide instruction on Hmong Americans and Asian Americans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-21 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Senator L. Johnson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2023-08-01 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb240 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB240.pdf |