WI SB240 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 38.12 (12), 66.0138 and 120.12 (28) of the statutes; relating to: funding postretirement health care benefits of local government employees. (FE)
Title
Funding postretirement health care benefits of local government employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb240 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB240.pdf |