WI SB24 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 71.98 (3); and to create 71.98 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the treatment of depreciation, depletion, and amortization for income and franchise tax purposes. (FE)
Title
The treatment of depreciation, depletion, and amortization for income and franchise tax purposes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb24 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB24.pdf |