WI SB237 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.019 (1m) (b) 1., 2. and 3., 118.019 (2) (a) 3., 118.019 (2) (a) 4., 118.019 (2) (a) 6., 118.019 (2) (b), 118.019 (2m) (b) (intro.), 118.019 (2r) (intro.) and 118.019 (3) (a), (b) and (c); to renumber and amend 118.019 (1m) (b) (intro.), 118.019 (2m) (a), 118.019 (2m) (b) 1., 118.019 (2m) (b) 2., 118.019 (2r) (a), 118.019 (2r) (b) and 118.019 (3) (intro.); to amend 115.29 (7), 118.019 (1), 118.019 (1m) (a), 118.019 (2) (intro.), 118.019 (2) (a) (intro.), 118.019 (2) (a) 1., 118.019 (2) (a) 2., 118.019 (2) (a) 5., 118.019 (2) (c), 118.019 (4), 118.019 (5) and 146.89 (3r) (e); and to create 118.019 (2) (a) 10., 118.019 (2) (a) 11., 118.019 (2) (e), 118.019 (2) (f), 118.019 (2m) (e), 118.019 (2m) (f) and 118.019 (2s) of the statutes; relating to: providing instruction in human growth and development. (FE)
Title
Providing instruction in human growth and development. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 7 adopted (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 7 adopted (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 216 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-22-2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 34, Paired 2 |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 7 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representatives Vruwink, Pasch, Pope-Roberts, Hintz, Milroy, Sinicki, Danou, Zepnick, Jorgensen and Doyle |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representatives Pasch, Pocan and Zamarripa |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 35 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Hintz |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative C. Taylor |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Zamarripa |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Roys |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Roys |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:05 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 13 laid on table |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 13 offered by Senators C. Larson and Erpenbach |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 12 adopted |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 12 offered by Senators C. Larson, Holperin, Vinehout, Taylor, Miller, Risser, Carpenter, S. Coggs, T. Cullen, Shilling, King and Erpenbach |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 11 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 11 offered by Senators C. Larson, Holperin, Vinehout, Taylor, Miller, Risser, S. Coggs, T. Cullen, Shilling, King and Erpenbach |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 10 adopted |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 10 offered by Senator Lazich |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 9 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 9 offered by Senators Vinehout, Holperin, C. Larson, King, Shilling, T. Cullen, S. Coggs, Risser, Miller, Hansen, Erpenbach and Taylor |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 8 adopted |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 8 offered by Senators Grothman and T. Cullen |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 7 adopted, Ayes 25, Noes 7 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 11-2-2011 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-2-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 7 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 7 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 6 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 5 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Grothman |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2011-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |