WI SB233 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 108.142 (4); to amend 108.06 (1); and to create 108.06 (1m) and 227.01 (13) (yL) of the statutes; Relating to: the amount of benefits received under the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Title
The amount of benefits received under the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-10 | Senate | LRB correction |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |