WI SB233 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 973.20 (2); and to create 40.08 (1t) and 973.20 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: withholding from a Wisconsin Retirement System lump sum payment or annuity to satisfy an order of restitution.
Title
Withholding from a Wisconsin Retirement System lump sum payment or annuity to satisfy an order of restitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Published 1-22-2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-21-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 71 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-17-2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |