WI SB233 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Published 12-1-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Published 12-1-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.835 (4) (ge) and 77.76 (3p); and to create 77.76 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: distributing excess sales tax revenue collected by a local professional football stadium district to Brown County and the municipalities within Brown County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Distributing excess sales tax revenue collected by a local professional football stadium district to Brown County and the municipalities within Brown County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-27 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Published 12-1-2015 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 114 |
2015-11-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-25-2015 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-10-27 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-27 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 89, Noes 2 |
2015-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 35 |
2015-10-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-10-27 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 12 |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Hansen, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Miller, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, L. Taylor and C. Larson |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-16-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Introduced |