WI SB230 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0903 (5) (h) and 103.49 (3g) (i) of the statutes; relating to: an exemption from the prevailing wage law for a public works project that is not less than 85 percent privately funded in which the completed facility is dedicated to the state or a local governmental unit for conservation, recreational, or educational purposes. (FE)
Title
An exemption from the prevailing wage law for a public works project that is not less than 85 percent privately funded in which the completed facility is dedicated to the state or a local governmental unit for conservation, recreational, or educational purposes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-12-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-12-19 | Senate | Representative Zamarripa withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2011-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb230 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB230.pdf |